Global Patent Index - EP 1063325 A2

EP 1063325 A2 2000-12-27 - Device for the tapering of yarn-gathering bobbins on a twisting frame

Title (en)

Device for the tapering of yarn-gathering bobbins on a twisting frame

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Konischmachen der Seiten einer Garnspule in einer Zwirnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rendre conique les côtés d'une bobine de fil textile dans un dispositif de retordage

Publication

EP 1063325 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202191 A

Priority

IT MI991404 A

Abstract (en)

A device for the tapering of yarn-gathering bobbins on a twisting frame comprises a traversing roller (11) which is actuated by the main motor of the twisting frame by means of appropriate mechanisms and is provided with a Z-shaped profile (12) generating a reciprocating motion in a connecting road (14) and where the law governing tapering of the bobbins is controlled by an inclinable tapering guide (19), which is kinematically connected to the aforesaid connecting road (14) and is able to vary the stroke of the reciprocating motion of the connecting road (14). If the said device, the inclination of the tapering guide (19) is adjusted by means of the operation of a pneumatic actuator (21), where each stroke of the pneumatic actuator (21) enables practically instantaneous variations in tapering having a pre-set value to be obtained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/36; B65H 54/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/32 (2006.01); D01H 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/36 (2013.01); B65H 54/325 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063325 A2 20001227; EP 1063325 A3 20020313; IT 1312508 B1 20020417; IT MI991404 A1 20001227; IT MI991404 D0 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040603

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI