Global Patent Index - EP 1063343 A1

EP 1063343 A1 2000-12-27 - Aqueous composition for preparing fibrous material for a thermal transfer printing process

Title (en)

Aqueous composition for preparing fibrous material for a thermal transfer printing process

Title (de)

Wässrige Zusammensetzung zur Ausrüstung von Fasermaterial für ein Thermotransferdruckverfahren

Title (fr)

Composition aqueuse pour l'apprêtage de matériaux fibrieux pour l'impression par transfert thermique

Publication

EP 1063343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103963 A

Priority

DE 19918890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19918890A1] Aqueous fiber finishing composition comprises a synthetic resin precondensate, a thermoplastic polymer with reactive groups and an acid-reactive inorganic salt. Aqueous composition for finishing fiber materials for heat transfer printing comprises: (a) 0.5-2.5 wt.% synthetic resin precondensate; (b) 10-30 wt.% thermoplastic polymer with reactive groups; (c) 0.1-1 wt.% acid-reactive inorganic salt; (d) 0.2-2.0 wt.% softener(s); and (e) 0.05-0.5 wt.% emulsifier. An Independent claim is included for a heat transfer printing process which uses a finishing composition as above.

Abstract (de)

Die Anmeldung betrifft eine wäßrige Zusammensetzung zur Ausrüstung von Fasermaterial für ein Thermotransferdruckverfahren, umfassend a) 0,5 bis 2,5 Gew.-% eines Kunstharzvorkondensates, b) 10 - 30 Gew.-% eines thermoplastischen Kunststoffes mit reaktiven Gruppen, c) 0,1 - 1 Gew.-% eines sauer reagierenden anorganischen Salzes, d) 0,2 bis 2,0 Gew.-% mindestens eines Weichmachungsmittels und e) 0,05 - 0,5 Gew.-% eines Emulgators. Sie betrifft ferner die Verwendung der Zusammensetzung für ein Thermotransferdruckverfahren und ein Thermodruckverfahren.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/423; D06M 15/29; D06M 15/39; D06P 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/39 (2006.01); D06P 1/54 (2006.01); D06P 1/56 (2006.01); D06P 1/58 (2006.01); D06P 5/24 (2006.01); D06P 1/52 (2006.01); D06P 3/14 (2006.01); D06P 3/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/54 (2013.01); D06P 1/56 (2013.01); D06P 1/58 (2013.01); D06P 5/003 (2013.01); D06P 1/5242 (2013.01); D06P 1/525 (2013.01); D06P 1/5257 (2013.01); D06P 3/14 (2013.01); D06P 3/60 (2013.01); Y10T 428/254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19918890 A1 20001102; EP 1063343 A1 20001227; KR 20010049270 A 20010615; TR 200000814 A2 20001121; TR 200000814 A3 20001121; US 6425927 B1 20020730

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060117

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031105

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI