Global Patent Index - EP 1063347 A1

EP 1063347 A1 2000-12-27 - Method of dosable dilution of pulp suspension in or before a head box of a paper machine

Title (en)

Method of dosable dilution of pulp suspension in or before a head box of a paper machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur dosierbaren Verdünnung der Faserstoffsuspension in oder vor einem Stoffauflauf einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la dilution dosée d'une suspension fibreuse dans ou avant la caisse de tête d'une machine à papier

Publication

EP 1063347 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106900 A

Priority

DE 19928488 A

Abstract (en)

To give a dosed dilution to a fiber suspension (S), at or in front of the stock inlet (1) of a papermaking machine (3), water dosing points (2) lie across the stock inlet (1) to deliver the diluting water (W). The diluting water (W) is the clouded filtrate (TF) taken from a filter unit (4), which processes the extracted water (SW2) from the second fourdrinier section of the papermaking machine (3). The filter unit (4) is a disk filter assembly with at least one filter disk (9) divided into segments (5), or it is a filter press. The filter (4) processes extracted water from the papermaking machine associated with the stock inlet being provided with the diluting water, using extracted water (SW2) from the second fourdrinier section of the papermaking machine (3). The clouded filtrate (TF) has a solid content of 100-500 ppm. The solid content of the extracted water being filtered is at least twice as high as in the clouded filtrate, at least at 600 ppm.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient der Verdünnung von in einem Stoffauflauf (1) einer Papiermaschine (3) geführten Faserstoffsuspension (S). Dabei wird zumeist in über den Stoffauflauf (1) quer verteilte Dosierstellen (2) in dosierter Form Verdünnungswasser (W) zugeführt, um z.B. das Flächengewichtsquerprofil einzustellen. Erfindungsgemäß wird das Verdünnungswasser (W) als Trübfiltrat (TF) einer Filtervorrichtung (4) entnommen, wobei die Filtervorrichtung (4) z.B. das 2. Siebwasser (SW2) der Papiermaschine (3) verarbeitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/08; D21F 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/08 (2006.01); D21F 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/08 (2013.01); D21F 1/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063347 A1 20001227; EP 1063347 B1 20050803; AT 301208 T 20050815; CA 2312301 A1 20001222; DE 19928488 C1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-03-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010863 P 20050908

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR LI SE

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FI FR LI SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR LI SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI