Global Patent Index - EP 1063357 A1

EP 1063357 A1 2000-12-27 - Barrier element

Title (en)

Barrier element

Title (de)

Leitplankenelement

Title (fr)

Elément de barrière

Publication

EP 1063357 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202193 A

Priority

NL 1012439 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention comprises a barrier element for separating a roadway from another terrain area, wherein the barrier element comprises a substantially elongate body part and hook parts arranged on the ends of the body part for hooking together successive barrier elements, wherein on a first end the hook ends are bent inward. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/088 (2013.01); E01F 15/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063357 A1 20001227; NL 1012439 C2 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010626

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI