Global Patent Index - EP 1063362 A2

EP 1063362 A2 2000-12-27 - System of prefabricated elements made of structural light concrete and of reinforced concrete for the total erection of 1 to 8 storey buildings

Title (en)

System of prefabricated elements made of structural light concrete and of reinforced concrete for the total erection of 1 to 8 storey buildings

Title (de)

System vorgefertigter Bauelemente in tragendem Leichtbeton und in bewehrtem Beton für den Bau gesamter Gebäude von ein bis acht Stockwerke

Title (fr)

Système d'éléments préfabriqués en béton léger structurel et en béton armé pour la construction totale de bâtiments de un à huit étages

Publication

EP 1063362 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830421 A

Priority

IT VI990129 A

Abstract (en)

This constructive system allows you to erect buildings for any type of use, especially for residential use. It foresees self-supporting panels for the various types perimetral walls, lintels for windows and doors, partition walls, slabs with or without balcony aggregates, two-or three-flight stairs with or without elevator, roofs complete with relevant coverings. This system also foresees various types of foundation elements - rectilinear, angular, T-shaped and cross-shaped - that are connected one another by means of male and female profiles and steel tie rods. The panels used for the perimetral and supporting walls can also be connected one another by means of steel tie rods. The slabs have: dap joint profiles made of cold-rolled steel sheet metal which will be connected one another by means of intermitted welding; PVC or steel pipes buried into them for the passage of household systems piping. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/04 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3583 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063362 A2 20001227; EP 1063362 A3 20010718; IT 1307458 B1 20011106; IT VI990129 A1 20001222

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020119

2002-05-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI