Global patent index - EP 1063368 A1

EP 1063368 A1 2000-12-27 - Work platform

Title (en)

Work platform

Title (de)

Arbeitsbühne

Title (fr)

Plate-forme de travail

Publication

EP 1063368 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112935 A

Priority

DE 19928574 A

Abstract (en)

The work platform (2) is set up using a device (1) with a bracket (3) or support section (12), against which the platform can rest. The support section or a support part (4) of the bracket allows one side (5) of the platform to be rested against a counter-bearing or a wall (7). A second support part (9) on this and the opposite side (6) of the platform also allows the platform to be rested against a counter-bearing or a wall (8). A safety device (10) on this opposite side is used to lock the set-up device into position whilst the platform is being used.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Arbeitsbühne mit folgenden Merkmalen: 1. Sie weist eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Aufnehmen und/oder Verstellen einer Arbeitsplattform (2) auf, 2. die Vorrichtung (1) zum Verstellen der Arbeitsplattform (2) ist mit einer Halterung (3) oder einem Abstützteil (12) wirkungsmäßig verbunden, an der die Arbeitsplattform (2) verstellbar angeordnet ist oder das als Auflageteil dient, 3. die Halterung (3) weist eine erste Einrichtung (4) oder das Abstützteil (12) auf, mittels der die Arbeitsplattform (2) im Bereich einer Seite (5) gegen ein Widerlager (27,28) oder eine Wand (7) abstützbar ist, 4. die Arbeitsplattform (2) weist auf der einen Seite (5) und einer gegenüberliegenden Seite (6) eine zweite Einrichtung (9) auf, die ebenfalls gegen ein Widerlager (27,28) oder eine Wand (8) abstützbar ist, 5. die der Halterung (3) gegenüberliegende Seite (6) ist mit einer Sicherungsvorrichtung (10) versehen, die zumindest in der Arbeitsposition der Arbeitsplattform (2) eine Arretierung der Arbeitsplattform (2) bewirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/36; B28B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] FR 2641018 A1 19881222 - OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 02 28 February 1997 (1997-02-28)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063368 A1 20001227; EP 1063368 B1 20050511; DE 19928574 A1 20010104; DE 19928574 C2 20011115; ES 2239966 T3 20051016

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2239966

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010263

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STINGL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040608

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI