Global Patent Index - EP 1063371 A2

EP 1063371 A2 2000-12-27 - Lock cylinder

Title (en)

Lock cylinder

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 1063371 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890194 A

Priority

AT 110799 A

Abstract (en)

The core (1) is rotarily mounted in a cylinder housing (2) and has a key-duct and tumblers radially fitting into the cylinder housing. An axial bore-hole with a key-operated slide piece (6) is positioned in the cylinder core's end surface (5) or in a cavity or protuberance in the end surface or in hard metal body (4) next to the key-duct. The slide-piece has a wedge-surface (8) for transmitting axial lifting movement to a radially guided locking body (10) slid into at least one cavity in the cylinder housing.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schließzylinder weist in der Stirnfläche (5) des Zylinderkernes (1) bzw. in einer Ausnehmung oder einem Vorsprung derselben bzw. eines Hartmetallkörpers (4) eine axial ausgerichtete Bohrung mit einem Schieber (6) auf, der von einem Teil einer Schlüsselreide eines Schlüssels (23) gegen Federkraft axial verschiebbar ist. Der Schieber (6) trägt eine Keilfläche (8) und überträgt mit dieser seine Einschubbewegung als Hubbewegung auf einen Sperrkörper (10). Dieser kann aus einer Gehäuseausnehmung (11) ausgehoben werden. Der Schlüssel (23) verfügt über eine Anschlagfläche (25) an einer Gegenfläche an der Stirnseite (5) des Zylinderkernes (1) zur Schlüsselbartpositionierung im Schlüsselkanal (7) und über eine Steuerfläche (26) zur Schieberpositionierung (6). Diese Flächen (25, 26) können in axialer Richtung parallel zueinander versetzt sein und von der Stirnfläche (5) des Zylinderkernes (1) abweichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 27/00; E05B 19/00; E05B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 27/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/0017 (2013.01); E05B 27/00 (2013.01); E05B 15/1614 (2013.01); E05B 27/0035 (2013.01); E05B 27/0042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063371 A2 20001227; EP 1063371 A3 20010207; AT 407273 B 20010226; AT A110799 A 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI