Global Patent Index - EP 1063374 A1

EP 1063374 A1 2000-12-27 - Key, specially for a motor vehicle, comprising a key blade and a gripping part

Title (en)

Key, specially for a motor vehicle, comprising a key blade and a gripping part

Title (de)

Schlüssel, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge, mit einem Schlüsselbart und einem Griffteil

Title (fr)

Clés, notamment de véhicule automobile, comportant une partie formant panneton et une partie de préhension

Publication

EP 1063374 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401759 A

Priority

FR 9907934 A

Abstract (en)

Key has support part (9), having at least part which is juxtaposed with head (4). Spring mechanism (5;8) which causes resetting of key stem (1) presses against end of support part and against head, both inserted into a location (L) at front of housing (2) so that support part is locked into location, whilst stem can pivot between its enclosed position and its out position. Key comprises body (2), metallic key stem (1) which includes insert (3) and head part (4) which is mounted so as to pivot around axis of housing (2) so that metallic key stem is contained within housing. Spring mechanism causes stem (1) to return to normal position when push-button (17) is pressed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; A45C 11/32; E05B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/32 (2006.01); E05B 19/04 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/043 (2013.01); A45C 11/324 (2013.01); G07C 9/00944 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00952 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063374 A1 20001227; EP 1063374 B1 20041208; DE 60016508 D1 20050113; DE 60016508 T2 20051215; ES 2232394 T3 20050601; FR 2795443 A1 20001229; FR 2795443 B1 20010914

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232394 T3

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016508 P 20050113

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI