Global Patent Index - EP 1063375 A1

EP 1063375 A1 2000-12-27 - Inertial blocking mechanism for use with an exit device

Title (en)

Inertial blocking mechanism for use with an exit device

Title (de)

Trägheitssperrmechanismus zur Verwendung bei einer Ausgangsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme inertiel de blocage pour l'utilisation avec un dispositif de sortie

Publication

EP 1063375 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00304539 A

Priority

US 13671599 P

Abstract (en)

An inertia operated blocking mechanism (40) for use with an exit device (10) which utilises a mass arm (50) on a rotatable link (41) to rotate, as a result of an impact loading on the non-device side of a door, the rotatable link into a confronting position with a pushbar (12) to prevent pushbar movement, relative to the exit device and door, caused by the impact loading, and therefore, prevent inadvertent device operation as a result of the impact loading. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1046 (2013.01); E05B 17/2084 (2013.01); E05B 15/0093 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063375 A1 20001227; EP 1063375 B1 20030924; CA 2309494 A1 20001128; DE 60005436 D1 20031030; DE 60005436 T2 20040701

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-05-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005436 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010619

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI