Global Patent Index - EP 1063378 A1

EP 1063378 A1 2000-12-27 - Hidden fitting for pivotally hung door or window

Title (en)

Hidden fitting for pivotally hung door or window

Title (de)

Verdeckter Öffnungsbeschlag für Drehflügeltür oder -Fenster

Title (fr)

Ferrure d'articulation invisible pour porte ou fenêtre à ouverture à la française ou similaire.

Publication

EP 1063378 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440182 A

Priority

FR 9907992 A

Abstract (en)

The articulation fitting comprises a fixed part (6) provided with a fixing (7) in the rabbet of the door frame (5). An articulation (9) in the shape of a ball joint (10) engages complementary articulation (11) connected to a movable part (13) housed in a covering strip fitting a door chassis (3). The fixing is defined by a strip (21) extending parallel to the door frame pivoting axis (20). This strip has a lateral extension extending perpendicular to its axis and constitutes a support base for the articulation. The fixing is completed by an adjuster enabling adjustment of the door position relative to the door frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04; E05D 5/02; E05D 5/06; E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 5/0238 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05D 15/5211 (2013.01); E05D 2007/0461 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/634 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063378 A1 20001227; EP 1063378 B1 20040519; DE 60010806 D1 20040624; DE 60010806 T2 20050616; FR 2795124 A1 20001222; FR 2795124 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060616

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010806 P 20040624

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI