Global Patent Index - EP 1063380 A2

EP 1063380 A2 2000-12-27 - Safety door-edge construction

Title (en)

Safety door-edge construction

Title (de)

Schliesskantensicherung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour bord de porte

Publication

EP 1063380 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112830 A

Priority

  • DE 19928828 A
  • DE 19937731 A

Abstract (en)

The safety device uses a safety rail incorporating an electrical switch with a number of contact elements positioned immediately after one another along an elastic hose, which is deformed upon contact with an obstacle in the closure path, for breaking the contact between the contact elements. An end stop (3) inserted in the elastic hose is provided with a contact bridge (4), enclosed by a cover cap (7) fitted into the end stop.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Schließkanten-Sicherung mit einem elastischen Schlauch und in diesem angeordneten Kontaktelementen, wobei der die Kontaktelemente aufnehmende Raum des Schlauches durch einen Verschlußstopfen verschlossen wird, der eine elektrischleitende Kontaktbrücke trägt, an die einenendes das Anschlußkabel und anderenendes eine Verbindung zur Kontaktkette hin angeordnet ist, wobei vorzugsweise die Verbindung zur Kontaktkette hin als elektrischleitendes Federelement gestaltet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/00; F16P 3/12; H01H 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01); H01H 3/14 (2006.01); H01H 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/142 (2013.01); E05F 15/44 (2013.01); E05F 2015/447 (2013.01); H01H 9/04 (2013.01); H01H 2003/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063380 A2 20001227; EP 1063380 A3 20050316; EP 1063380 B1 20080709

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130617

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-01-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090414

2008-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015250

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-08-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2005-12-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2005-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI