Global Patent Index - EP 1063382 A1

EP 1063382 A1 2000-12-27 - Window wing frame

Title (en)

Window wing frame

Title (de)

Fensterflügelrahmen

Title (fr)

Cadre pour battant de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1063382 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112231 A

Priority

EP 99112231 A

Abstract (en)

The hollow profile encloses the window pane (19) with a U-shaped cross-sectional part (18) of the frame-arms (13). The exterior arm (22) of the U-shaped cross-sectional part is formed by one angle-side of an angled strip (17). The other angle-side sits in a holder (31, 32) on the back (30) of the U-shaped cross-sectional part. Preferred Features: The outer-side edge of the back has a forked cross-section. The outer fork-arm (31) is longer than the inner arm. The outer fork-arm, preferably its part protruding beyond the inner arm has a lug (33) behind which rests the ledge on the angled strip.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fensterflügelrahmen aus Hohlprofil, der die Fensterscheibe (19) mit einem im wesentlichen U-förmigen Querschnittsteil (18) der Rahmenschenkel (13) einfaßt, insbesondere zum Einsatz in einer in Skelettbauweise mit Pfosten (1) und Riegeln aus Hohlprofil errichteten Glaswand, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der außenseitige Schenkel (22) des U-förmigen Querschnittsteils (18) durch den einen Winkelschenkel der Winkelleiste (17) gebildet ist, deren anderer Winkelschenkel (36) in einer am Rücken (30) des U-förmigen Querschnittsteils (18) ausgebildeten Halterung eingerastet sitzt. Die Halterung ist so innerhalb der Erstreckung des Rückens zwischen den beiden Schenkeln des U-förmigen Querschnittsteils ohne zusätzlichen Platzbedarf senkrecht zur Fassadenebene gebildet und auch ohne wesentliche Verdickung des Rückens, d.h. ohne merkliche zusätzliche Platzbeanspruchung in der Fassadenebene. Bei Herstellung der Winkelleiste aus Kunststoff ist die Lösung auch wärmeisolierend; der außenseitige Schenkel stellt dann keine Wärmebrücke in den Kaltbereich dar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E04B 2/96; E06B 3/58; E06B 3/62; E06B 7/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/308 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19507067 A1 19960905 - PHILIPPI GERD [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063382 A1 20001227; EP 1063382 B1 20061004; AT 341689 T 20061015; DE 59913899 D1 20061116

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913899

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100610

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PHILIPPI, GERD

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-01-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913899 P 20061116

2006-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040609

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI