Global Patent Index - EP 1063383 A2

EP 1063383 A2 2000-12-27 - Assembly apparatus for insulating glazing filled with a heavy gas

Title (en)

Assembly apparatus for insulating glazing filled with a heavy gas

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zusammenbauen von Isolierglasscheiben, deren Innenraum mit einem Schwergas gefüllt ist

Title (fr)

Machine d'assemblage de vitrages isolants remplis de gaz lourd

Publication

EP 1063383 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890072 A

Priority

AT 109999 A

Abstract (en)

The two plates (1) positioned on both sides of a pack (10) consisting of a first (12) and second (11) glass pane and a spacer-piece (13) placed against one of the two glass panes include two sealing arrangements (25,26). The seals are preferably spaced apart from the vertical edge of the set of panes. A conveyor belt (5) is near the lower part of the plates. Inert gas is supplied to the interior of the insulating glass panes by means of a duct (30). The surface of the conveyor belt on which the glass panes stand is permeable to gas.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von mit Schwergas gefüllten Isolierglasscheiben sind die Glasscheiben (11, 12) eines Scheibenpaketes aus zwei Glasscheiben (11, 12) und einem Abstandhalter (13) nach unten hin nicht abgedichtet. Dies ergibt sich dadurch, daß die Förderbänder (17) auf welchen das Scheibenpaket (10) aufsteht, auf ihrer Außenseite mit Abstand voneinander angeordnete Vertiefungen (50) aufweisen, so daß zwischen den unteren Rändern der Glasscheiben (11, 12) des Scheibenpaketes (10) und den Förderbändern (17) des Bandförderers (5) Durchgangsöffnungen (51) vorgesehen sind. Diese Durchgangsöffnungen (51) erlauben es, daß die im Bereich des unteren Randes des Scheibenpaketes (10) befindlichen Räume (60) vollständig mit Schwergas gespült werden, einerseits, und daß andererseits beim Schließen des Scheibenpaktes (10) durch Aufsetzen der Glasscheibe (12) auf den Abstandhalter (13) ein Druckausgleich auch über den unteren Rand, nämlich durch die Durchgangsöffnungen (51), erfolgen kann, so daß rascher als bisher zusammengestellt und verpreßt werden kann, ohne daß in der Isolierglasscheibe Überdruck entsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/677

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/677 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/6775 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0674086 A1 19950927 - LISEC PETER [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063383 A2 20001227; EP 1063383 A3 20020925; AT 407552 B 20010425; AT A109999 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI