Global Patent Index - EP 1063384 A2

EP 1063384 A2 2000-12-27 - Ventilation device

Title (en)

Ventilation device

Title (de)

Lüftungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation

Publication

EP 1063384 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110800 A

Priority

  • DE 29910661 U
  • DE 29910662 U
  • DE 29910663 U

Abstract (en)

The air duct inside the ventilation device (1) contains an elastic part used to alter the flow cross-section, and this part is oriented at an angle of ca. 45 deg. inside a chamber (65) defined by an outer profile rail (8) and an intermediate piece (9) forming the device housing (6).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Lüftungsvorrichtung (1) für Räume mit einem schmalen, langgestreckten Gehäuse (6), wobei das Gehäuse (6) in einen seinen Abmessungen angepaßten Spalt zwischen Flügel- oder Rahmenschenkel (5, 5') eines Fensters oder Tür und dem Rand eines darin angeordneten Füllelementes (3), z. B. einer Isolierverglasung, einsetzbar ist und das Gehäuse (6) an dem Füllelement (3) befestigbar ist. Das Gehäuse wird (6) aus einer inneren und einer äußeren Profilschiene (7, 8) gebildet, wobei diese durch einen Zwischenkörper miteinander verbunden sind, die durch querverlaufende Durchtrittsöffnungen (10, 11, 11', 12) den Strömungsquerschnitt bilden. Um die Lüftungsvorrichtung (1) an unterschiedliche Abmessungen insbesondere der Stärke des Füllelementes (3) anpassen zu können, ist vorgesehen, daß eine der Profitschienen (7, 8) zusammen mit dem Zwischenkörper (9) eine Anlagekante (28) für das Füllelement (3) bildet, und daß eine der Profilschienen (7, 8) gegenüber dem Zwischenkörper (9) quer verschiebbar und durch Mittel (33) relativ zu diesem sicherbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/06; E06B 7/10; F24F 11/047; F24F 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/06 (2006.01); E06B 7/10 (2006.01); F24F 11/047 (2006.01); F24F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01); E06B 7/06 (2013.01); F24F 11/047 (2013.01); F24F 13/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063384 A2 20001227; EP 1063384 A3 20020904; PL 340898 A1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI