Global Patent Index - EP 1063384 A3

EP 1063384 A3 2002-09-04 - Ventilation device

Title (en)

Ventilation device

Title (de)

Lüftungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation

Publication

EP 1063384 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110800 A

Priority

  • DE 29910661 U
  • DE 29910662 U
  • DE 29910663 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1063384A2] The air duct inside the ventilation device (1) contains an elastic part used to alter the flow cross-section, and this part is oriented at an angle of ca. 45 deg. inside a chamber (65) defined by an outer profile rail (8) and an intermediate piece (9) forming the device housing (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/06; E06B 7/10; F24F 11/047; F24F 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/06 (2006.01); E06B 7/10 (2006.01); F24F 11/75 (2018.01); F24F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01); E06B 7/06 (2013.01); F24F 11/75 (2018.01); F24F 13/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063384 A2 20001227; EP 1063384 A3 20020904; PL 340898 A1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI