Global Patent Index - EP 1063391 A2

EP 1063391 A2 2000-12-27 - Valve drive for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve drive for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventiltrieb für eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1063391 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112962 A

Priority

DE 19928284 A

Abstract (en)

The valve is retained in position by a valve spring held between spring plate and spring bearing. The adjustable valve spring bearing consists of meshing adjusting rings (102,103), which are turned in opposite directions. The inner ring (102) has a surface (104) to support the valve spring, and during turning against the outer ring is moved in direction of the valve axis. Both rings have elements esp. profiling, to prevent turning in the opposite direction.

Abstract (de)

Für einen Ventiltrieb zur Steuerung des Gaswechsels in Verbrennungskraftmaschinen mit einer das Ventil (20) stets in seiner geforderten Stellung haltenden Ventilfeder, die zwischen dem Ventilfederteller und einem in Richtung der Ventilachse verstellbaren Ventilfederlager eingespannt ist, soll die Einstellung einer definierten Federvorspannung für jedes einzelne Ventil ausführbar sein. Hierfür ist vorgesehen, das verstellbare Ventilfederlager aus zwei ineinanderfassenden und gegensinnig verdrehbaren Stellringen zu bilden, von welchen der innere Stellring (102) eine Fläche zur Auflage der Ventilfeder aufweist und durch das Verdrehen gegen den äußeren Stellring (103) in Richtung der Ventilachse bewegbar ist. Die Stellringe weisen dabei Elemente zur Verhinderung einer Rückdrehung auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/32 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01); F01L 3/08 (2006.01); F01L 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/462 (2013.01); F01L 1/32 (2013.01); F01L 1/46 (2013.01); F01L 3/08 (2013.01); F01L 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063391 A2 20001227; EP 1063391 A3 20010502; EP 1063391 B1 20041020; DE 19928284 A1 20001228; US 6279526 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070620

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060620

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060620

2006-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050603

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008293 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01L 1/32 A, 7F 01L 9/04 B, 7F 01L 3/10 B, 7F 01L 1/46 B, 7F 01L 3/08 B

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI