Global Patent Index - EP 1063397 A2

EP 1063397 A2 2000-12-27 - Pump housing for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Pump housing for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Pumpengehäuse für Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Carter de pompe pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1063397 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305246 A

Priority

  • GB 9914696 A
  • GB 9917122 A

Abstract (en)

A pump housing 10 for mounting on an internal combustion engine block comprising an integral body having a recess 22 for a coolant pump and a passageway for communicating coolant between an inlet 28 to and outlet 36, 38 from the coolant pump, and a recess 56 for a lubricant pump and a passageway for communicating lubricant between an inlet 60 to and outlet 62 from the lubricant pump. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/10; F01M 1/02; F01M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/00 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/06 (2006.01); F01M 5/00 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F02B 77/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 5/002 (2013.01); F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 2001/1014 (2013.01); F01M 2001/1092 (2013.01); F01M 2011/033 (2013.01); F01M 2011/035 (2013.01); F01M 2011/036 (2013.01); F02B 77/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063397 A2 20001227; EP 1063397 A3 20020410; AU 4261500 A 20010104; BR 0002860 A 20010130; CA 2312604 A1 20001223; CN 1280246 A 20010117; GB 0014238 D0 20000802; GB 2351322 A 20001227; ID 26426 A 20001228; JP 2001020712 A 20010123; KR 20010007490 A 20010126; NO 20003274 A 20001227; NO 20003274 D0 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI