Global Patent Index - EP 1063405 A2

EP 1063405 A2 2000-12-27 - Housing for a load control device

Title (en)

Housing for a load control device

Title (de)

Gehäuse für eine Lastverstellvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour dispositif de commande de charge

Publication

EP 1063405 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109410 A

Priority

DE 19928631 A

Abstract (en)

The housing consists of two parts connected via a fastener, e.g. a metal plate strip (10) held on one of the housing parts (2,3). The strip has beading (12) to engage behind a circumferential edge (9) of the other housing part. One housing part is cup-shaped to contain the drive for the adjusting device, and has the edge. The second housing part forms a cover and is formed integrally with the metal strip. This part is an injection-molded plastic part, and the strip is of aluminum.

Abstract (de)

Ein Gehäuse (1) für eine Lastverstellvorrichtung eines Stellantriebs für eine Drosselklappe einer Brennkraftmaschine mit zwei Gehäuseteilen (2, 3) hat einen umlaufenden Blechstreifen (10). Der Blechstreifen (10) hintergreift jeweils einen Rand (8, 9) der Gehäuseteile (2, 3). Die Gehäuseteile (2, 3) sind damit gleichmäßig gegeneinander vorgespannt und zuverlässig gegeneinander abgedichtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 7/23 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/0203 (2013.01); F02D 9/1065 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2186 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063405 A2 20001227; EP 1063405 A3 20010801; EP 1063405 B1 20050720; BR 0002775 A 20010130; DE 19928631 A1 20001228; KR 20010066870 A 20010711; US 6487934 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010733

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010733 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI