Global Patent Index - EP 1063409 A2

EP 1063409 A2 2000-12-27 - Piston for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Piston for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kolben für einen Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Piston pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1063409 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111733 A

Priority

DE 19929102 A

Abstract (en)

The piston has a ring-shaped cooling channel with at least three apertures (3,4,5). An outlet aperture (4) is positioned opposite to two alternately useable intake apertures (3,5) in such a way, that the intakes are positioned symmetrically relative to a central axis extending through the outlet. Intake and outlet channels (6,7,8) are rotary-symmetrical, and are conical in an area away from the cooling channel. The diameter of the apertures is approx. 1/25 to 1/5 of the piston diameter.

Abstract (de)

Kolben für einen Verbrennungsmotor mit einem ringförmig angeordneten Kühlkanal, der Zulauf- und Ablauföffnungen aufweist, wobei Kühlöl durch eine Kühlöldüse als freier Ölstrahl über einen Zulaufkanal in die Zulauföffnung und damit in den Kühlkanal zuführbar ist und durch mindestens eine Ablauföffnung über einen Ablaufkanal abführbar ist, wobei der Kühlkanal (2) zumindest drei Öffnungen (3, 4, 5) aufweist, wobei in der Kühlkanalebene gesehen der einen Ablauföffnung (4) gegenüberliegend zwei wechselseitig zu nutzende Zulauföffnungen (3, 5) derart angeordnet sind, daß die Öffnungen (3, 5) in Bezug auf eine durch die Ablauföffnung (4) verlaufende Mittelachse symmetrisch angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4340891 A1 19950608 - MAHLE GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063409 A2 20001227; EP 1063409 A3 20010919; EP 1063409 B1 20040811; DE 19929102 A1 20001228; PL 340320 A1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-18 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090623

2009-11-18 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090623

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FEDERAL-MOGUL HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-07-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007347 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI