Global Patent Index - EP 1063411 A2

EP 1063411 A2 2000-12-27 - Exhaust gas recirculation duct for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust gas recirculation duct for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Abgasrückführleitung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Conduit de recirculation de gaz d'échappement pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1063411 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102592 A

Priority

DE 19929449 A

Abstract (en)

The exhaust return pipe (6) is integrated in a cylinder head (1) on the end face of the IC engine in such a way, that it passes through a cooling water chamber (7) of the cylinder head at right angles to its longitudinal direction. A closure flap (5) is fitted into the end of the exhaust return pipe facing the exhaust pipe (2). A tube bundle heat exchanger is integrated in the return pipe. A back pressure valve (3) between return pipe and exhaust cooler (4) is part of a seal between cooler and cylinder head.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Abgasrückführleitung für Brennkraftmaschinen. Bei der Abgasrückführung an Brennkraftmaschinen für Fahrzeuge bereiten die Raumprobleme Schwierigkeiten. Einerseits benötigt die Abgasrückführleitung zusätzlichen Bauraum und andererseits bereiten die Temperaturprobleme in dem zusätzlich beengten Bauraum Sorgen. Erfindungsgemäß wird daher vorgeschlagen die Abgasrückführleitung in einem der stirnseitigen Zylinderkopfe anzuordnen, derart, daß die Abgasrückführleitung den Kühlwasserraum quer zur Längsrichtung der Brennkraftmaschine durchdringt. Das rückzuführende Abgas gelangt also von der Abgasleitung durch die vom Kühlwasser umströmte Abgasrückführleitung zur Ladeluftleitung. Dadurch wird eine eigene Abgasrückführleitung eingespart, das Abgas wird gekühlt und es wird jegliche Abstrahlung von Wärme in den umgebenden Raum vermieden, so daß evtl. Brandgefahr durch Wärmestau ausgeschlossen werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/59 (2016.02); F02M 26/30 (2016.02); F02M 26/32 (2016.02); F02M 26/41 (2016.02); F02M 26/40 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063411 A2 20001227; EP 1063411 A3 20010711; EP 1063411 B1 20040908; DE 19929449 A1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG, 80995 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50007662

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-04-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-03-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110304

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007662 P 20041014

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION DUCT FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI