Global Patent Index - EP 1063418 A2

EP 1063418 A2 2000-12-27 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Injecteur de combustible

Publication

EP 1063418 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305223 A

Priority

GB 9914792 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injector comprising a valve needle (12) slidable within a bore (11), a surface associated with the valve needle (12) being exposed to the fuel pressure within a control chamber (20), and a valve arrangement (23, 26) controlling the fuel pressure within the control chamber (20), the valve arrangement comprising an inlet fluid pressure actuable valve (23) controlling communication between a supply passage (16) and the control chamber (20), and an outlet fluid pressure actuable valve (26) controlling communication between the control chamber (20) and a drain chamber (29), the inlet and outlet fluid pressure actuable valves (23, 26) being operable under the influence of fluid pressure within a common pressure chamber (35). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0033 (2013.01); F02M 63/008 (2013.01); F02M 2200/703 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063418 A2 20001227; EP 1063418 A3 20021211; EP 1063418 B1 20031210; DE 60007030 D1 20040122; DE 60007030 T2 20050105; GB 9914792 D0 19990825

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040620

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040620

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007030 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI