Global Patent Index - EP 1063420 A2

EP 1063420 A2 2000-12-27 - Fuel supply system

Title (en)

Fuel supply system

Title (de)

Kraftstoffversorgungsanlage

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en carburant

Publication

EP 1063420 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305314 A

Priority

GB 9914790 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel supply system for supplying fuel to an engine has a common rail (11) and injectors (14,15,16) which are located inside a housing (17), e.g. a rocker cover, of the engine. The injectors (14,15,16) are mounted directly on the common rail (11) rather than being connected to the common rail (11) by connection lines. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02; F02M 61/14; F02M 69/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063420 A2 20001227; EP 1063420 A3 20030806; GB 9914790 D0 19990825

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040207

2004-06-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/02 A

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/14 B

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 69/46 B

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 B

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI