Global Patent Index - EP 1063422 A1

EP 1063422 A1 2000-12-27 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Injecteur de combustible

Publication

EP 1063422 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00305328 A

Priority

GB 9914546 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injector comprising a nozzle body (10) provided with a first bore (11) defining a seating (12), a valve needle (19) being reciprocable within the bore (11) and engageable with the seating (12) to control the delivery of fuel through an outlet opening (13). The fuel injector comprises an elongate guide member (16) mounted within the bore (11), the guide member (16) being provided with a second bore (18) within which part of the valve needle (19) is received to guide the valve needle (19) for movement within the first bore (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/12; F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063422 A1 20001227; EP 1063422 B1 20050330; DE 60019026 D1 20050504; DE 60019026 T2 20060126; GB 9914546 D0 19990825

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019026 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040122

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI