Global Patent Index - EP 1063434 A3

EP 1063434 A3 2001-02-21 - Wall anchor for reinforcing and/or securing walls

Title (en)

Wall anchor for reinforcing and/or securing walls

Title (de)

Maueranker zum Bewehren und/oder Sichern von Mauern

Title (fr)

Boulon de maçonnerie pour le renforcement et/ou la consolidation de murs

Publication

EP 1063434 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110041 A

Priority

DE 19923080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923080A1] The anchor has a long anchor section (7a,b) for insertion in an opening (5) in one or more masonry blocks (2a-g). At least one abutment (8a,b,14) is provided on the anchor section. The abutments can be pushed into the opening, or the blocks may slide over the abutments. The abutments brace against the opening to prevent movement of the anchor or block in the opposite direction. An Independent claim is included for a tool to release an inserted anchor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 13/08; E04B 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/16 (2006.01); E04B 1/35 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3583 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0221 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0245 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923080 A1 20001207; EP 1063434 A2 20001227; EP 1063434 A3 20010221; US 6513296 B1 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010822

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI