Global Patent Index - EP 1063456 A2

EP 1063456 A2 2000-12-27 - Integrated turbo pump and control valve system

Title (en)

Integrated turbo pump and control valve system

Title (de)

Integrierte Turbopumpe und Steuerventilsystem

Title (fr)

Turbopompe et système de valves de commande integré

Publication

EP 1063456 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112690 A

Priority

US 33908299 A

Abstract (en)

A gas delivery system comprises a gate valve that can be connected between a turbo pump and a process chamber. The gate valve includes a valve body, a valve seat and a housing constructed to support the valve seat, wherein (a) the valve body is secured within the housing so as to move relative to the valve seat between an opened position and a closed position, and (b) the housing is provided with a gas passageway connected to each of the spaces on opposite sides of the valve body when the valve body is in the closed position. A plurality of valves are mounted to the housing of the gate valve and arranged so as to control the flow of gas through the passageway so that in operation the chamber and turbo pump each can be pumped down through the gas passageway with a second pump connected to one of the valves, and gas can be transferred and the flow controlled through the passageway bypassing the valve body when the valve body is in the closed position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 3/06; F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F16K 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 3/06 (2013.01); F04D 19/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86083 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87338 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87515 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063456 A2 20001227; EP 1063456 A3 20020807; EP 1063456 B1 20051109; DE 60023793 D1 20051215; DE 60023793 T2 20060810; US 6161576 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023793 P 20051215

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI