Global Patent Index - EP 1063468 A1

EP 1063468 A1 2000-12-27 - Lamp, in particular beacon light for air navigation height obstacles

Title (en)

Lamp, in particular beacon light for air navigation height obstacles

Title (de)

Lampe, insbesondere Markierungslampe für hohe, den Flugverkehr beeinträchtigende Hindernisse

Title (fr)

Lampe, en particulier lampe de balisage pour obstacles à la navigation aérienne en élevation

Publication

EP 1063468 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401413 A

Priority

FR 9908069 A

Abstract (en)

The lamps has two separable parts, a part (2) forming an electrical supply connection, which is fitted with a connecting cable (4) and plug, and a part (3) forming the light source, which has a cap (9) which can be coupled electrically and mechanically to the part (2). The electrical supply to the lamp is provided from a voltage transformer (8). The transformer (8) including its magnetic circuit forms two separate parts (8a,8b), a primary part (8a) and a secondary part (8b). The electrical connection between the cap (9) and the feed part (2) is assured by electromagnetic induction, without any direct contact. The part (2) has a body (6) made from an electrically insulating plastic. The part (9) is also made from an electrically insulating plastic. The body (6) and part (9) are fixed to each other via sensible plane contact surfaces (6a,9a). The primary part (8a) of the transformer is contained in plastic insulating material of the body (6) and the transformer secondary part (8b) is contained in the plastic material of the part (9) so that after connecting the two parts (6,9), the two parts (12a,12b) of the transformers (8) magnetic circuits form a sensibly closed magnetic circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/02; F21S 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/02 (2006.01); H01F 38/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/02 (2013.01); H01F 38/14 (2013.01); H05B 41/02 (2013.01); F21W 2111/00 (2013.01); F21W 2111/06 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/30 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063468 A1 20001227; FR 2795483 A1 20001229; FR 2795483 B1 20010921

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI