Global Patent Index - EP 1063470 A2

EP 1063470 A2 2000-12-27 - Process and apparatus for the thermal purification of an exhaust gas

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the thermal purification of an exhaust gas

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur thermischen Reinigung eines Rohgases

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la purification thermique d'un gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1063470 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112856 A

Priority

DE 19928214 A

Abstract (en)

The thermal cleaning appliance comprises at least three heat-collector chambers (2,3,4)which can be connected by reversible control units (26-28, 35-37) to the crude gas supply and or clean gas discharge. The heat-collector chambers are also connected to at least one combustion chamber (11). The clean gas discharge is connected to a gas buffer (44) which on the outlet side can be connected to the crude gas inflow and or at least one of the heat-collector chambers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur thermischen Reinigung eines mittels einer Rohgaszufuhr gelieferten Rohgases in einem regenerativen Prozeß, mit folgenden Schritten: Durchleitung des Rohgases durch eine zuvor mittels Reingas aufgeheizte erste Wärmespeicherkammer in eine Verbrennungskammer, Ableitung des durch Verbrennung in der Verbrennungskammer aus dem Rohgas gebildeten Reingases durch eine aufzuheizende zweite Wärmespeicherkammer in eine Reingasabfuhr, Umschaltung der vorstehend genannten Gasströmung während eines Kammerregenerations - Betriebszustands derart, daß das Rohgas die zweite Wärmespeicherkammer und das Reingas die erste Wärmespeicherkammer durchströmt, wobei während des Kammerregenerations-Betriebszustands (Burn-out-Prozeß) Gas aus der Verbrennungskammer eine dritte Wärmespeicherkammer zu deren Kammerregeneration durchströmt und in die Rohgaszufuhr eingespeist wird, Pufferung von beim Umschalten durch Eintritt von Rohgas in das Reingas gebildetem Mischgas und Rückführung des gepufferten Mischgases in die Rohgaszufuhr und/oder in die dritte Wärmespeicherkammer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/068 (2013.01); F23G 2900/70601 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063470 A2 20001227; EP 1063470 A3 20011024; EP 1063470 B1 20061206; DE 19928214 A1 20001228; DE 19928214 C2 20010913; DE 50013827 D1 20070118; ES 2276650 T3 20070701

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100618

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2007-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2276650 T3

2007-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013827 P 20070118

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-12-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050224

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAENEL, MATTHIAS

2001-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPECK, ULRICH

2001-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIMON, RAINER

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI