Global Patent Index - EP 1063471 A1

EP 1063471 A1 2000-12-27 - Nozzle connection for oil burner

Title (en)

Nozzle connection for oil burner

Title (de)

Düsenstock für einen Ölbrenner

Title (fr)

Raccord de buse pour brûleur à combustible liquide

Publication

EP 1063471 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112924 A

Priority

DE 19928589 A

Abstract (en)

The burner has a tuyere connection with a quill (8) connected to the fuel supply by means of a feeder duct (10) in the tuyere connection ,and by a connecting pipe (2). The burner has a breaker valve (11) for the feeder duct, with at least one valve body (17). The valve body is connected to an electrically operated actuator (12) formed by a piezo-electric control.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Brenner für flüssige Brennstoffe, insbesondere Ölbrenner, der einen Düsenstock mit einer Zerstäuberdüse (8) aufweist, die über einen Zufuhrkanal (10) und über eine Verbindungsleitung (2) mit einer Brennstoffversorgung in Verbindung steht, und der ein dem Zufuhrkanal (10) zugeordnetes Unterbrecherventil (11) mit wenigstens einem Ventilkörper (17; 24.2, 25.1) aufweist, der mit einem durch elektrische Energie betätigbaren Aktuator (12) in Verbindung steht der durch ein piezoelektrisches Betätigungsmittel gebildet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/14; F02M 59/46; F02M 63/00; F23D 11/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/28 (2006.01); F23K 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/147 (2013.01); F23D 11/28 (2013.01); F23C 2205/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063471 A1 20001227; DE 19928589 A1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041026

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI