Global Patent Index - EP 1063474 A1

EP 1063474 A1 2000-12-27 - Electromagnet assembly for a safety gas valve

Title (en)

Electromagnet assembly for a safety gas valve

Title (de)

Elektromagneteinheit für einer Sicherheitsventil

Title (fr)

Ensemble à électro-aimant pour une soupape de sûreté à gaz

Publication

EP 1063474 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500103 A

Priority

ES 9901372 A

Abstract (en)

Electromagnet assembly (1) for a safety gas valve comprising an electromagnet (4a,6,7,11) with two windings (6,7), a moving armature (4a) connected to the valve member (4), being attracted to open the flow of gas in the main pipe of a tap, a sealed casing (3) for the electromagnet, a metal socket (5) for electrical contact to ground, two output leads (8,9), and an electrical insulating member for the tight sealing (12) of the casing (3), traversed by said output leads (8,9). One arm (11a) of the U-shaped core has a winding for the actuating attraction, and the other arm (11b) has a thick wire winding energised by a holding thermocouple. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/105 (2013.01); F23N 5/10 (2013.01); F23N 2900/05101 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063474 A1 20001227; EP 1063474 B1 20030514; DE 60002632 D1 20030618; DE 60002632 T2 20040408; ES 2154594 A1 20010401; ES 2154594 B1 20011101; PT 1063474 E 20030829

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061127

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-11-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061127

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060526

2005-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002632 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT PT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI