Global Patent Index - EP 1063479 A2

EP 1063479 A2 2000-12-27 - Ventilating system

Title (en)

Ventilating system

Title (de)

Belüftungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de ventilation

Publication

EP 1063479 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105253 A

Priority

JP 17769399 A

Abstract (en)

A ventilating system is proposed which comprises an air passage communicating between an outdoor side and an indoor side. In order to prevent noise entering from the outdoor side and sound escaping from the indoor side and to prevent outdoor air invading at wind speed over a specific value, a part of the air passage is defined by a hexagonal frame main body whose cross section is reduced gradually from outdoor side to indoor side. Further, it is provided a sound deadening member which is a hexagonal sound absorbing cone member comprising an outside sound deadening portion which is a first hexagonal cone whose apex is directed to the outdoor side and an inside sound deadening portion which is a second hexagonal cone whose apex is directed to the indoor side, so that the cross section of the air passage is reduced gradually from the apex of the first hexagonal cone to a bottom surface portion thereof and increased gradually from the bottom surface portion thereof to the apex of the second hexagonal cone. Furthermore, an opening and shutting mechanism is provided in the air passage to close the air passage when wind speed of the outdoor side exceeds a specific value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/70 (2006.01); E04F 17/04 (2006.01); F24F 7/00 (2006.01); F24F 7/04 (2006.01); F24F 11/047 (2006.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/24 (2013.01); F24F 11/047 (2013.01); F24F 2007/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H02938861 B1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063479 A2 20001227; EP 1063479 A3 20020522; EP 1063479 B1 20041013; CA 2300441 A1 20001224; JP 2001003552 A 20010109; JP 3522158 B2 20040426

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): SE

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): SE

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/24 A, 7F 24F 13/08 B

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI