Global Patent Index - EP 1063482 A1

EP 1063482 A1 2000-12-27 - Refrigeration device

Title (en)

Refrigeration device

Title (de)

Kühlvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif frigorifique

Publication

EP 1063482 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112174 A

Priority

EP 99112174 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical connections (62) run at least partially in thermal contact with the first pulse tube (20) and/or partially in thermal contact with the first regenerator (40).

Abstract (de)

Offenbart ist eine Kühlvorrichtung, die folgende Komponenten umfaßt: einen ersten Pulsröhrenkühler mit einem ersten Pulsrohr 20, das einen Warmkopf mit einer ersten Temperatur TA1 und einen Kaltkopf 24 mit einer bezüglich der ersten Temperatur tieferen zweiten Temperatur TE aufweist, und einem ersten Regenerator 40, der einen warmen Endabschnitt 44 und einen kalten Endabschnitt 46, welcher mit dem Kaltkopf des ersten Pulsrohrs verbunden ist, aufweist; ein zu kühlendes Objekt 82, das an den Kaltkopf des ersten Pulsröhrenkühlers thermisch gekoppelt ist; und eine Verbindungseinrichtung 62 zum mechanischen oder elektrischen Verbinden des zu kühlenden Objekts mit einer Anschlußeinrichtung 60, die eine bezüglich der zweiten Temperatur TE höhere Temperatur TV aufweist. Erfindungsgemäß verläuft die Verbindungseinrichtung zur deren Vorkühlung dabei zumindest teilweise in thermischem Kontakt entlang des ersten Pulsrohrs vom Warmkopf zum Kaltkopf und/oder teilweise in thermischem Kontakt entlang des ersten Regenerators vom warmen Endabschnitt zum kalten Endabschnitt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 9/14; H01F 6/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/145 (2013.01); F25B 9/10 (2013.01); F25B 2309/1408 (2013.01); F25D 19/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • "Info-Phys-Tech", VDI TECHNOLOGIEZENTRUM, PHYSIKALISCHE TECHNOLOGIEN, no. 6, - 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01)
  • C. WANG ET AL., CRYOGEN FREE OPERATION OF A NIOBIUM-TIN MAGNET USING A TWO-STAGE PULSE TUBE COOLER, - 1 January 1998 (1998-01-01), PALM DESERT, KONFERENZ APPLIED SUPERCONDUCTIVITY
  • G. THUMMES: "Small scale he liquefaction using a two stage 4k pulse tube cooler", CRYOGENICS 1998, vol. 00, no. 0, - 1 January 1998 (1998-01-01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063482 A1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI