Global Patent Index - EP 1063485 A1

EP 1063485 A1 2000-12-27 - Device and process for air separation by cryogenic distillation

Title (en)

Device and process for air separation by cryogenic distillation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Luftzerlegung durch Tieftemperaturrektifikation

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de séparation d'air par distillation cryogénique

Publication

EP 1063485 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401768 A

Priority

FR 9907931 A

Abstract (en)

An air separation plant has a mixing column and at least one double column with a low pressure connected to a mid-pressure column via a vaporizer-condenser. A second vaporizer-condenser vaporizes a liquid containing 22 - 70 mol% oxygen received from the low pressure column and partly condenses air to be supplied to the double column. An Independent claim is included for the following: (a) Air separation as above. Preferred Features: Untreated air is supplied direct to the bottom of the low pressure column. A nitrogen rich gas leaves the top of the mid-pressure column. Liquid from the bottom of the mid-pressure column goes partly to the second vaporizer-condenser and partly to a first level in the mid-pressure column. The vaporized liquid from the second vaporizer-condenser goes to a relatively lower level in the mid-pressure column.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04878 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04466 (2013.01); F25J 2200/06 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/40 (2013.01); F25J 2250/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063485 A1 20001227; EP 1063485 B1 20050406; DE 60019198 D1 20050512; DE 60019198 T2 20060309; FR 2795496 A1 20001229; FR 2795496 B1 20010803; US 6339938 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090621

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090621

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019198 P 20050512

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DE BUSSY, FRANEOIS

2004-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUDAS, FREDERIC

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI