Global Patent Index - EP 1063487 A1

EP 1063487 A1 2000-12-27 - Plate heat exchanger, especially for cooling oil of motor vehicles

Title (en)

Plate heat exchanger, especially for cooling oil of motor vehicles

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher, insbesondere zum Kühlen von Kraftfahrzeugöl

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques, en particulier pour le refroidissement d'une huile de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1063487 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401419 A

Priority

FR 9907833 A

Abstract (en)

Heat exchanger comprises multiplicity of stacked plates (10) each with raised peripheral edge (14). Peripheral edges are assembled in sealed manner so as to delimit between plates first (24) and second (26) flow channels for alternating first and second fluids. Raised peripheral edges are plane and form with stacking direction (D) acute angle ( alpha ) greater than or equal to 10 degrees .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 5/00 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0089 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063487 A1 20001227; EP 1063487 B1 20030806; DE 60004295 D1 20030911; DE 60004295 T2 20040609; ES 2207471 T3 20040601; FR 2795166 A1 20001222; FR 2795166 B1 20010907; JP 2001050673 A 20010223; MX PA00006139 A 20030924

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-11-29 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 60004295

- Effective date: 20121129

2012-09-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-19 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60004295

2012-04-19 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60004295

2012-01-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207471 T3

2004-02-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004295 P 20030911

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI