Global Patent Index - EP 1063490 A2

EP 1063490 A2 2000-12-27 - Electric ignition device for an ammunition propellant charge

Title (en)

Electric ignition device for an ammunition propellant charge

Title (de)

Elektrische Anzündeinrichtung für die Treibladung einer Patrone

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'allumage électrique pour une charge propulsive de munition

Publication

EP 1063490 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111768 A

Priority

DE 19928832 A

Abstract (en)

An electric ignition unit for the propellant charge of a cartridge, especially an infantry cartridge, comprises an induction spool (18) with a connected ignition bridge (24). The spool has a flexible carrier substrate (12) with a spool winding structure. The bridge consists of the spool winding structure material, and has a small cross section.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine elektrische Anzündeinrichtung (10) für die Treibladung einer Patrone, insbesondere einer Infanteriepatrone, mit einer Induktionsspule (18) beschrieben, die mit einer Zündbrücke (24) in Reihe zusammengeschaltet ist. Die Induktionsspule (18) weist ein flexibles Trägersubstrat (12) auf, das mit einer Spulenwindungsstruktur (32) versehen ist. Die gemeinsam mit der Spulenwindungsstruktur (32) am flexiblen Trägersubstrat (12) ausgebildete Zündbrücke (24) besteht aus dem Metall der Spulenwindungsstruktur (32) und besitzt einen im Vergleich zur Spulenwindungsstruktur (32) kleinen Brückenquerschnitt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 19/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063490 A2 20001227; EP 1063490 A3 20020612; DE 19928832 A1 20001228; NO 20003301 A 20001227; NO 20003301 D0 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050103

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI