Global patent index - EP 1063571 A8

EP 1063571 A8 2001-04-04 - Developing solutions for printing plates

Title (en)

Developing solutions for printing plates

Title (de)

Entwicklerlösungen für Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Solutions de développement pour plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 1063571 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00200067 A

Priority

IT MI991378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1063571A1] This invention relates to a washing solvent designed to remove the unpolymerised part of a photopolymer exposed to light, in particular in flexographic printing processes, characterised in that the said solvent comprises 25 to 70% in weight of an alicyclic hydrocarbon, 15 to 50% in weight of an aromatic hydrocarbon and 10 to 30% in weight of an aliphatic alcohol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 7/32; C11D 7/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/50 (2006.01); G03F 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/24 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/262 (2013.01); C11D 7/261 (2013.01); C11D 7/5022 (2013.01); G03F 7/325 (2013.01); C11D 7/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063571 A1 20001227; EP 1063571 A8 20010404; IT MI991378 A1 20001221; IT MI991378 D0 19990621; US 6291141 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040828

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHIMEKO S.R.L. TRADE CHIMICO ECOLOGICO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: WASHING SOLVENT DESIGNED TO REMOVE THE UNPOLYMERISED PART OF A LAYER OF PHOTOPOLYMER EXPOSED TO LIGHT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVELOPING SOLUTIONS FOR PRINTING PLATES

2001-01-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: CHIMEKO S.R.L. TRADE CHIMICO ECOLOGICO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI