Global Patent Index - EP 1063614 A8

EP 1063614 A8 2001-03-14 - Apparatus for using a plurality of facial images from different viewpoints to generate a facial imagnem neuen Blickpunkt zu erzeugen, dessen Verfahrene from a new viewpoint, method thereof, applicatio, Gerät und Speichermedium n apparatus and storage medium

Title (en)

Apparatus for using a plurality of facial images from different viewpoints to generate a facial imagnem neuen Blickpunkt zu erzeugen, dessen Verfahrene from a new viewpoint, method thereof, applicatio, Gerät und Speichermedium n apparatus and storage medium

Title (de)

Gerät zum Verwenden mehrere Gesichtsbilder aus verschiedenen Blickpunkten um ein Gesichtsbild aus ei

Title (fr)

Appareil utilisant plusieurs images faciales de différents points de vue pour générer une image faciale à partir d'un nouveau point de vue, méthode correspondante , appareil et support d'enregistrement

Publication

EP 1063614 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00305266 A

Priority

JP 17601199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1063614A2] Seed matches are found between a plurality of images of a common object. The present invention simplifies the implementation of the morphing process. The present invention is a seed finding unit comprising a feature point detection unit for detecting feature points from said plurality of images; a correlation calculating unit for calculating the correlation between the feature points in said plurality of images and for calculating combinations of said feature points; a matching unit for removing combinations of said feature points that have low probability based on the condition of an image seen from a plurality of viewpoints; a camera orientation determining unit for determining the position of said plurality of viewpoints and the direction of viewing rays; a match propagation unit for selecting those combinations of said feature points that are geometrically and statistically highly reliable under the geometrical constraints of the viewing rays, and for adjusting the analysis range of the images of said object. By using the constraints of the viewpoint position and direction of viewing rays, seed match finding with high precision is possible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01); H04N 5/262 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 7/97 (2017.01); G06T 2207/20228 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063614 A2 20001227; EP 1063614 A3 20020529; EP 1063614 A8 20010314; JP 2001067463 A 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06T 17/20 A, 7G 06T 15/70 B

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINITEFACE.COM INC.

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: QUAN, LONG

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIYAZAWA, TAKEO

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LHUILLIER, MAXIME

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI