Global Patent Index - EP 1063615 A1

EP 1063615 A1 2000-12-27 - IMAGE GENERATING DEVICE AND IMAGE GENERATING METHOD

Title (en)

IMAGE GENERATING DEVICE AND IMAGE GENERATING METHOD

Title (de)

BILDGENERIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND BILDGENERIERENDES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF GENERATEUR D'IMAGE ET PROCEDE GENERATEUR D'IMAGE

Publication

EP 1063615 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99959923 A

Priority

  • JP 9907154 W
  • JP 37592698 A

Abstract (en)

An image generating device for forming a behind object prepared with polygon data as a part of the background of a virtual three-dimensional space and generating images of the movement of a character object prepared with polygon data in this virtual three-dimensional space. A visual field seen from a viewpoint is operated, and behind objects OTa, OTb, and OTc positioned within this visual field and observable from the viewpoint are specified. Moreover, judged is whether it is the specific condition wherein the character object OTch is within the visual field and positioned in the space closer to the viewpoint side than the specified behind object. The character object OTch is incorporated as the object of display only when it is judged as being this specific condition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/50 (2014.01); G06F 3/0481 (2013.01); G06T 15/00 (2011.01); G06T 15/40 (2011.01); G06T 15/50 (2011.01); G06T 17/00 (2006.01); G06T 19/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/52 (2013.01); A63F 13/10 (2013.01); A63F 13/65 (2014.09); A63F 13/822 (2014.09); G06T 15/10 (2013.01); G06T 15/40 (2013.01); G06T 15/503 (2013.01); G06T 19/00 (2013.01); A63F 2300/6009 (2013.01); A63F 2300/6027 (2013.01); A63F 2300/663 (2013.01); A63F 2300/69 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063615 A1 20001227; EP 1063615 A4 20030604; EP 1063615 B1 20070124; CN 1230789 C 20051207; CN 1291318 A 20010411; CN 1595415 A 20050316; DE 69934972 D1 20070315; DE 69934972 T2 20071025; EP 1587034 A2 20051019; EP 1587034 A3 20110413; ES 2284279 T3 20071101; JP 2000182077 A 20000630; JP 4240343 B2 20090318; KR 100641671 B1 20061103; KR 20050007430 A 20050117; US 2007262986 A1 20071115; US 7479958 B1 20090120; WO 0038116 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69934972

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121220

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101221

2012-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120305

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120105

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101220

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284279 T3

2007-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69934972 P 20070315

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA SEGA DOING BUSINESS AS SEGA CORPO

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-09-03 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06T 15/00 A, 7G 06T 15/40 B, 7G 06T 17/00 B

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE