Global patent index - EP 1063619 A1

EP 1063619 A1 2000-12-27 - Security module and method for protecting the postal register against manipulation

Title (en)

Security module and method for protecting the postal register against manipulation

Title (de)

Sicherheitsmodul und Verfahren zur Sicherung der Postregister vor Manipulation

Title (fr)

Module de sécurité et procédé pour protection du registre postal contre la manipulation

Publication

EP 1063619 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250185 A

Priority

DE 19928057 A

Abstract (en)

The security module has a program memory (128) and first and second data processors (120,150) with non-volatile memories (114,116). These are operatively connected together to allow the first processor (120) to charge up a postage value credit in the memories and to enable the second processor (150) to carry out the reckoning and store the post register data. The first processor has an internal non-volatile memory and is programmed by a program in the program memory. The processor is programmed to check the validity of the stored data when the postage is deducted. When the data is valid new postage data is calculated. A code based on information from the data is formed and stored in memory. Independent claims also cover a security method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Sicherheitsmodul mit einer ersten und zweiten Datenverarbeitungseinheit (120, 150), mit nichtflüchtigen Speichern (114, 116) für Postregisterdaten und Verfahren zur Sicherung der Postregisterdaten vor Manipulation. Zu einem ersten Zeitpunkt ti, mindestens nach Briefanlage und nach einer Überprüfung der bisher gültigen Abrechnungsdaten anhand eines Autorisierungscodes MACalt, nimmt die erste Datenverarbeitungseinheit (120) eine Vorausberechnung des neuen Postregistersatzes vor, der sich unter Berücksichtigung des zuvor eingestellten Portowertes ergibt, und bildet einen neuen Autorisierungscode MACneu. Zu einem zweiten Zeitpunkt ti+1, nimmt die zweite Datenverarbeitungseinheit (150) eine Abrechnung mit Berechnung des neuen Postregistersatzes vor, der sich unter Berücksichtigung des eingestellten Portowertes ergibt. Abschließend erfolgt eine Speicherung des vorausberechneten neuen Autorisierungscode MACneu und des von der zweiten Datenverarbeitungseinheit (150) ermittelten neuen Postregistersatzes in den nichtflüchtigen Speichern (114, 116). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00298 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00306 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00346 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6362724 B1 20020326; DE 19928057 A1 20001228; DE 19928057 B4 20051110; DE 50014030 D1 20070322; EP 1063619 A1 20001227; EP 1063619 B1 20070207

INPADOC legal status

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070416

2007-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014030

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-03-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-02-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI