Global Patent Index - EP 1063620 A1

EP 1063620 A1 2000-12-27 - Vending machine for cooked foods

Title (en)

Vending machine for cooked foods

Title (de)

Verkaufsautomat für gekochte Nahrungsmittel

Title (fr)

Machine de vente pour produits alimentaires cuisinés

Publication

EP 1063620 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99112246 A

Priority

EP 99112246 A

Abstract (en)

The vending machine for cooked foods comprises a cabinet, including a selection and cashing panel, inside which are positioned at least: a storing section, for storing single packets of (normally pre-cooked) foods, preferably at a temperature suitable for the conservation of frozen products; a mechanical hand, equipped with grippers, that lifts a packet of the food selected by a consumer through the selection and cashing panel from the storing section to an oven belonging to a cooking section and deposits the packet inside an oven; the cooking section, providing for at least one oven for completing the cooking of at least one packet of food selected by at least one consumer. If the cooking section provides for two or more ovens, the cooking of two or more packets of food(s) is (or can be) completed at the same time. Preferably, the vending machine further comprises a logic unit which manages at least the mechanical hand and the oven(s) belonging to the cooking section. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/10 (2006.01); G07F 11/42 (2006.01); G07F 11/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/0078 (2013.01); G07F 9/105 (2013.01); G07F 11/42 (2013.01); G07F 11/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063620 A1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2001-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAS INTERNATIONAL S.P.A.

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010619

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI