Global Patent Index - EP 1063628 A2

EP 1063628 A2 2000-12-27 - Display

Title (en)

Display

Title (de)

Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1063628 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305261 A

Priority

  • GB 9914768 A
  • GB 9926608 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a method of manufacturing a display, particularly for chilled products, which includes an improved simulation of ice blocks. The method comprises manufacturing a display (10) by creating a plurality of blocks (13, 14) of transparent plastics material, characterised by coating at least some of these blocks (13, 14) individually with a transparent film of material, assembling said coated blocks (13, 14) together within a pre-formed and at least partly transparent housing assembly (16, 17) and sealing the blocks (13, 14) within said assembly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 7/00; G09F 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 19/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063628 A2 20001227; EP 1063628 A3 20010926; GB 0015033 D0 20000809; GB 2351382 A 20001227; GB 2351382 B 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI