Global Patent Index - EP 1063632 A1

EP 1063632 A1 2000-12-27 - Water resistant device for immersion in water and comprising a sound transducer

Title (en)

Water resistant device for immersion in water and comprising a sound transducer

Title (de)

Wasserdichte Vorrichtung zur Verwendung unter Wasser und mit einem Schallwandler

Title (fr)

Appareil étanche susceptible d'être immergé et comprenant un transducteur sonore

Publication

EP 1063632 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99112092 A

Priority

EP 99112092 A

Abstract (en)

A watchcase (1) has a support (9) at it's base for a microphone and loudspeaker transductor (22) mounted on a deformable membrane (17). The membrane has a rim (18) which is glued to the support (9) and the transductor (22) is held in position by elastic fittings (20). The transmission of vibrations from the transductor to the watchcase is blocked by a peripheral rim (40) on the deformable membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 9/122; G04B 37/00; G04B 37/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/00 (2006.01); G04B 37/11 (2006.01); G10K 9/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/11 (2013.01); G04B 37/0075 (2013.01); G10K 9/122 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0899635 A1 19990303 - ASULAB SA [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063632 A1 20001227; EP 1063632 B1 20070704; DE 69936448 D1 20070816; DE 69936448 T2 20080306; DK 1063632 T3 20071105

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120623

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120623

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110606

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080407

2007-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

- Free text: ASULAB S.A.#FAUBOURG DU LAC 6#CH-2501 BIENNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ASULAB S.A.#RUE DES SORS 3#2074 MARIN (CH)

2007-11-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

2007-11-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071008

2007-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2007-10-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69936448 P 20070816

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2007-07-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI