Global Patent Index - EP 1063645 A8

EP 1063645 A8 2001-03-28 - Optical recording medium and recording and/or reproducing method and apparatus employing the optical recording medium

Title (en)

Optical recording medium and recording and/or reproducing method and apparatus employing the optical recording medium

Title (de)

Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabeverfahren, und Gerät zur Verwendung dieses optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums

Title (fr)

Support d'enregistrement optique, procédé d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction, et appareil pouvant utiliser ce support d'enregistrement optique

Publication

EP 1063645 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00113255 A

Priority

JP 17719599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1063645A2] An optical recording medium is capable of linear recording in a photon mode. An organic material changed in molecular orientation on light illumination to exhibit birefringence is used as a recording material. For example, a recording layer having, as a recording material, an organic material changed in molecular orientation caused by trans-cis rearrangement, is changed in birefringence with changes in the molecular orientation of the organic material. The recording system which utilizes the changes in the molecular orientation of the organic material has linear characteristics and gives outputs different depending on e.g., the degree or the angle of orientation, thus enabling multi-valued recording.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/73 (2006.01); G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/004 (2006.01); G11B 7/0045 (2006.01); G11B 7/125 (2006.01); G11B 7/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/244 (2006.01); G11B 7/25 (2006.01); G11B 7/257 (2006.01); G11B 7/135 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/1365 (2013.01); G11B 7/0045 (2013.01); G11B 7/128 (2013.01); G11B 7/1387 (2013.01); G11B 7/24 (2013.01); G11B 7/244 (2013.01); G11B 7/25 (2013.01); G11B 7/257 (2013.01); G11B 7/24088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063645 A2 20001227; EP 1063645 A3 20060315; EP 1063645 A8 20010328; EP 1063645 B1 20101110; AT 488005 T 20101115; AU 4255700 A 20010104; AU 772493 B2 20040429; CA 2312124 A1 20001223; CN 1180410 C 20041215; CN 1287355 A 20010314; DE 60045204 D1 20101223; JP 2001006208 A 20010112; JP 4107767 B2 20080625; KR 100719431 B1 20070517; KR 20010007502 A 20010126; TW 501120 B 20020901; US 6650615 B1 20031118

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120621

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120621

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60045204

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120621

2013-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 488005 T

- Effective date: 20120621

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-12-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60045204

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60045204 P 20101223

2010-12-01 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2010-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION

2010-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMAMOTO, MASANOBU

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SABI, YUICHI

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YASUDA, AKIO,C/O SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2010-06-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION

2005-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY INTERNATIONAL (EUROPE) GMBH

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI