Global patent index - EP 1063667 A1

EP 1063667 A1 2000-12-27 - Medium voltage fuse with a visual indication of the opened condition in a fuse

Title (en)

Medium voltage fuse with a visual indication of the opened condition in a fuse

Title (de)

Mittelspannungssicherung mit Signaliereinrichtung von der Sicherungstrennung

Title (fr)

Fusible moyenne tension avec une signalisation visuelle de la coupure du fusible

Publication

EP 1063667 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401810 A

Priority

FR 9908146 A

Abstract (en)

The fuse has a cylindrical body and a visible indication of fuse rupture. The fuse has a sealed cylindrical body (2) extending along an axial direction (A), with a percussion device (4) mounted inside the sealed body (2). This is arranged to be displaced along the axial direction (A) when it is actuated, to act on a part (9) used to signal fuse rupture. The visual signalization piece has a rounded head (10) connected to a circular base (11) by a foot (12) around which is rolled a ribbon (13). The piece (9) is mounted co-axially in an extension section at the end of the fuse body (2) and is separated from the percussion device (4) by a flexible sealing disk (14). The disk closes an end of the fuse and is mounted on a co-axial crown (6,7) fixed in the fuse body. The circular base (11) is mounted so as to press against the fixed crown (6,7), and the rounded head (10) has a diameter sufficient to close the tubular extension part. The base of the part (9) has breakable ribs (11), which break when the percussion device is activated, so as to expel the head (10) from the tubular body (8). The ribbon (13) has an end fixed to the fusible body, and an end fixed to the foot of the signalization piece, so that when it is expelled it hangs from body to visually signal fuse rupture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/303 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063667 A1 20001227; FR 2795551 A1 20001229; FR 2795551 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060426

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI