Global Patent Index - EP 1063710 A1

EP 1063710 A1 2000-12-27 - Semiconductor light emitting device

Title (en)

Semiconductor light emitting device

Title (de)

Lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif semi-conducteur émetteur de lumière

Publication

EP 1063710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00401569 A

Priority

JP 15761699 A

Abstract (en)

A semiconductor light emitting device using nitride III-V compound semiconductors is improved to reduce the threshold current density with almost no increase of the operation voltage. In a GaN semiconductor laser as one version thereof, the p-type cladding layer (10) is made of two or more semiconductor layers (10a, 10b) different in band gap, and a part (10a) of the p-type cladding layer (10) near one of its boundaries nearer to the active layer is made of a semiconductor layer having a larger band gap than that of the remainder part (10b). More specifically, in a AlGaN/GaN/GaInN SCH-structured GaN semiconductor laser, a p-type AlGaN cladding layer (10) is made of a p-type Alx1Ga1-x1N layer (10a) in contact with a p- type GaN optical guide layer (9), and a p-type Alx2Ga1-x2N layer (10b) overlying the p-type Alx1Ga1-x1N layer (10a) (where 0x2<x11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/06 (2010.01); H01L 33/32 (2010.01); H01S 5/00 (2006.01); H01S 5/20 (2006.01); H01S 5/323 (2006.01); H01S 5/343 (2006.01); H01S 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/32 (2013.01); H01S 5/20 (2013.01); H01S 5/2004 (2013.01); H01S 5/3211 (2013.01); H01S 5/32341 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063710 A1 20001227; EP 1063710 B1 20040818; DE 60013039 D1 20040923; DE 60013039 T2 20050908; JP 2000349397 A 20001215; JP 4750238 B2 20110817; KR 100634273 B1 20061016; KR 20010007215 A 20010126; US 6603147 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150605

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150605

2015-05-28 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60013039

- Effective date: 20150410

2015-04-10 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60013039

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013039 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI