Global Patent Index - EP 1063721 A1

EP 1063721 A1 2000-12-27 - Planar antenna for a portable radio device

Title (en)

Planar antenna for a portable radio device

Title (de)

Flachantenne für Mobilfunkgeräte

Title (fr)

Antenne plane pour radiotéléphonie mobile

Publication

EP 1063721 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00660116 A

Priority

FI 991447 A

Abstract (en)

An antenna part (401, 501) for portable radio devices (402, 502) comprises a planar radiator (202) bounded by a certain first outline and attachment means (211, 403, 404) for mechanically attaching the antenna part to a portable radio device. Additionally it comprises a ground plane (204, 414) which is essentially parallel to the planar radiator (202), separated from the planar radiator (202) by a certain essentially constant distance and bounded by a second outline which is essentially the same as the first outline. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063721 A1 20001227; FI 991447 A0 19990624; FI 991447 A 20001225

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI