Global Patent Index - EP 1063840 A2

EP 1063840 A2 2000-12-27 - Enchanced color correction

Title (en)

Enchanced color correction

Title (de)

Verbesserte Farbkorrekturschaltung

Title (fr)

Circuit de correction de couleur amélioré

Publication

EP 1063840 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201568 A

Priority

US 13173399 P

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus for correcting the color of an image signal. Data in a first color space such as RGB is converted (502) to primary/secondary/combined color space by setting combined color word equal to the minimum of the input values, the primary color word equal to the maximum of the input values minus the combined color word, and the secondary color word equal to the median of the input values minus the combined color word. A set of three coefficients is selected (506) for each of the primary color word, the secondary color word, and the combined color word. The primary, secondary, and combined color words are then multiplied by the coefficients by a matrix multiplier (504) to yield color-corrected data in the first color space. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 9/67; H04N 1/60; H04N 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/46 (2006.01); H04N 1/60 (2006.01); H04N 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/60 (2013.01); H04N 1/6016 (2013.01); H04N 9/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063840 A2 20001227; EP 1063840 A3 20040721; JP 2000358252 A 20001226; KR 100703105 B1 20070405; KR 20010029676 A 20010406; TW 476217 B 20020211; US 6594387 B1 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110818

2009-09-30 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080226

2005-04-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 9/67 A

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 1/60 B

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 9/68 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 9/67 A

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI