Global Patent Index - EP 1063898 A1

EP 1063898 A1 2001-01-03 - INCREASED BIOAVAILABILITY OF LUTEIN AND ZEAXANTHIN IN HUMANS AND POULTRY USING LYSOLECITHIN AND LECITHIN

Title (en)

INCREASED BIOAVAILABILITY OF LUTEIN AND ZEAXANTHIN IN HUMANS AND POULTRY USING LYSOLECITHIN AND LECITHIN

Title (de)

ERHÖHTE BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT VON LUTHEIN UND ZEAXANTHIN IN MENSCH UND GEFLÜGEL DURCH VERWENDUNG VON LYSOLEZITHIN UND LEZITHIN

Title (fr)

BIODISPONIBILITE ACCRUE DE LA LUTEINE ET DE LA ZEAXANTHINE CHEZ L'HOMME ET LA VOLAILLE AU MOYEN DE LA LYSOLECITHINE ET DE LA LECITHINE

Publication

EP 1063898 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912665 A

Priority

  • US 9905925 W
  • US 7847598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947001A1] A method of increasing the absorption of carotenoids and, more specifically, to increasing the absorption and bioavailability of lutein and zeaxanthin in humans and poultry by the use of lysolecithin and lecithin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23K 1/00; A23K 1/14; A23K 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23K 1/16 (2006.01); A23K 1/18 (2006.01); A23L 1/275 (2006.01); A23L 1/303 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23K 20/179 (2016.05); A23K 20/158 (2016.05); A23K 50/75 (2016.05); A23L 5/44 (2016.08); A23L 33/155 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947001 A1 19990923; AU 3098899 A 19991011; AU 745973 B2 20020411; BR 9908891 A 20011002; EP 1063898 A1 20010103; EP 1063898 A4 20030604; MX PA00009116 A 20030728

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEMIN FOODS, L.C.

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040830

2003-06-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE