Global Patent Index - EP 1063905 A1

EP 1063905 A1 2001-01-03 - CHAIN ELEMENTS OF A JEWELLERY CHAIN

Title (en)

CHAIN ELEMENTS OF A JEWELLERY CHAIN

Title (de)

KETTENELEMENTE EINER SCHMUCKKETTE

Title (fr)

ELEMENTS D'UNE CHAINE

Publication

EP 1063905 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915594 A

Priority

  • DE 29804808 U
  • EP 9901652 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947017A1] The invention relates to chain elements of a jewellery chain, which have a clamp-like U-shaped section comprising legs (3, 4) which extend outwards from a head (2) and can be expanded against an opposing spring force. At least one of these legs is configured such that it can click into place behind a detent surface (11, 12) positioned on another chain element (1). The invention is characterized in that the chain elements (1) are identical, in that at least one leg (3, 4) of each chain element has at its free base a detent (7, 8) provided with a detent surface (11, 12) and in that the detent (9, 10) of the one chain element (1) cooperates in a locking manner with the detent surface (11, 12) of another, opposite chain element (2) which is turned 90 DEG , whereby the two elements are placed base to base such that their longitudinal axes are in alignment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947017A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804808 U1 19980514; EP 1063905 A1 20010103; EP 1063905 B1 20030514; WO 9947017 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905559

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905559

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DAU, CARL F.

- Free text: DAU, CARL F.#HOHENTWIELSTEIG 10#14163 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DAU, CARL F.#HOHENTWIELSTEIG 10#14163 BERLIN (DE)

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905559 P 20030618

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI