Global Patent Index - EP 1063928 A1

EP 1063928 A1 2001-01-03 - PERCUTANEOUS SURGICAL CAVITATION DEVICE

Title (en)

PERCUTANEOUS SURGICAL CAVITATION DEVICE

Title (de)

PERKUTANES CHIRURGISCHES AUSHÖHLUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL DE FORMATION PERCUTANEE DE CAVITE

Publication

EP 1063928 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912522 A

Priority

  • US 9905593 W
  • US 3973698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5928239A] A device and method for percutaneous surgical cavitation. The device includes an elongated shaft and cutting tip interconnected by a freely-rotating hinge. Upon rotation of the shaft to a sufficient velocity, the cutting tip will be deflected toward a position that is angularly offset from the shaft's access of rotation. The length of the cutting tip will determine the radius of the cavity being formed, which may be several times the radius of the shaft. The method of the present invention provides for formation of a cavity within a body through a small percutaneous access opening such that an enlarged cavity may be formed without an invasive access opening. The present invention also provides a method of percutaneous prophylactic replacement of osteoporotic bone wherein weakened bone material is removed from a cavity using only a needle-sized access opening. Strengthening bone replacement material, such as bone cement, can be injected into the cavity to provide reinforcement of weakened bone without invasive surgical access.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/32; A61B 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/16 (2006.01); A61B 17/22 (2006.01); A61B 17/32 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/320725 (2013.01); A61B 17/1668 (2013.01); A61B 17/32002 (2013.01); A61B 17/1617 (2013.01); A61B 17/1684 (2013.01); A61B 17/1686 (2013.01); A61B 17/8805 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00261 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320044 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320733 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5928239 A 19990727; AU 3088399 A 19991011; CA 2324136 A1 19990923; CA 2324136 C 20050222; DE 69932604 D1 20060914; DE 69932604 T2 20070809; EP 1063928 A1 20010103; EP 1063928 A4 20040506; EP 1063928 B1 20060802; WO 9947055 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140315

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69932604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140315

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69932604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130314

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69932604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-02-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PERCUTANEOUS SURGICAL CAVITATION DEVICE

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-05-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 17/32 A

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 17/16 B

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT