Global Patent Index - EP 1063929 A1

EP 1063929 A1 2001-01-03 - ROTATIONAL ATHERECTOMY DEVICE WITH IMPROVED EXCHANGEABLE DRIVE SHAFT CARTRIDGE

Title (en)

ROTATIONAL ATHERECTOMY DEVICE WITH IMPROVED EXCHANGEABLE DRIVE SHAFT CARTRIDGE

Title (de)

ROTIERENDES ATHEREKTOMIEINSTRUMENT MIT AUSTAUSCHBAREN ANTRIEBSWELLENMODUL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ATHERECTOMIE ROTATIF AVEC CARTOUCHE D'ARBRE D'ENTRAINEMENT ECHANGEABLE

Publication

EP 1063929 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912524 A

Priority

  • US 9905597 W
  • US 3973298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947056A1] A rotational atherectomy device which includes a handle housing (10), and an exchangeable drive shaft cartridge (60) removably attachable to the handle housing (10). A rotatable prime mover is carried by a prime mover carriage (30) disposed within the handle housing (10). The exchangeable cartridge includes a cartridge housing (62), a longitudinally movable tube (70), a slide (64), and a rotatable flexible drive shaft (21). The rotational atherectomy device includes a cartridge latch, and a tube latch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/32 (2006.01); A61B 17/22 (2006.01); F16D 43/14 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 43/14 (2013.01); A61B 17/320758 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0046 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00477 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00685 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00867 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320766 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947056 A1 19990923; AT 422153 T 20090215; AT 467391 T 20100515; AU 3088599 A 19991011; AU 760938 B2 20030522; CA 2335291 A1 19990923; CA 2335291 C 20100202; DE 69940380 D1 20090319; DE 69942379 D1 20100624; EP 1063929 A1 20010103; EP 1063929 A4 20060412; EP 1063929 B1 20090204; EP 2027822 A1 20090225; EP 2027822 B1 20100512; ES 2322108 T3 20090616; ES 2342510 T3 20100707; JP 2002506670 A 20020305; JP 4142250 B2 20080903; US 6024749 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090204

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090505

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-10-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090706

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090504

2009-08-03 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2322108 T3

2009-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940380 P 20090319

2009-03-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC.

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060912

2006-04-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC.

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE